EP0533419 - Lock-up clutch control system of vehicle automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakaguchi, Shinichi, c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, 1-chome, Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Ichiro, c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, 1-chome, Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308340.6 | 14.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | JP19910263012 | 14.09.1991 Original published format: JP 26301291 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533419 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533419 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/14 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
F16H61/143 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0057 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0015 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0081 (EP,US);
F16H2061/145 (EP,US);
F16H61/14 (EP,US);
Y10S706/90 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/12] | Title | German: | Überbrückungskupplungssteuerung für ein automatisches Kraftfahrzeuggetriebe | [1993/12] | English: | Lock-up clutch control system of vehicle automatic transmission | [1993/12] | French: | Système de commande d'embrayage à verrouillage pour une transmission automatique de véhicule | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 27.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP03125062 ; | [A]JP02212668 ; | [AD]JP03103665 ; | [AP]JP04000060 ; | [A]EP0126201 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG); | [A]US4957194 (SAWA KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0410223 (FORD WERKE AG [DE], et al); | [AP]US5095435 (TOKORO SETSUO [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 329 (M-1149)21 August 1991 & JP-A-03 125 062 ( TOYOTA ) 28 May 1991, & JP03125062 A 19910528 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 514 (M-1046)13 November 1990 & JP-A-02 212 668 ( MAZDA ) 23 August 1990, & JP02212668 A 19900823 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 290 (M-1139)23 July 1991 & JP-A-03 103 665 ( TOYOTA ) 30 April 1991, & JP03103665 A 19910430 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 137 (M-1231)7 April 1992 & JP-A-04 000 060 ( TOYOTA ) 6 January 1992, & JP04000060 A 19920106 | Examination | US4841815 |