EP0533430 - Multiple processor computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heil, Thomas F. 101 Hickory Wood Court Easley, SC 29640 / US | 02 /
Walrath, Craig A. 205 Fairfax Road Easley, SC 29642 / US | 03 /
Pike, Jimmy D. 119 Firebranch Road Columbia, SC 29212 / US | 04 /
McDonald, Edward A. 164 Meadow Wood Drive Lexington, SC 29072 / US | 05 /
Cochcroft, Arthur F., Jr. 3209 Witon Road West Columbia, SC 29170 / US | 06 /
Raeuber, P. Chris 126 Old Cedar Lane Central, SC 29630 / US | 07 /
Robbins, Daniel C. 321 Jamestown Road Easley, SC 29640 / US | 08 /
Young, Gene F. 3412 Sweet Springs Road Lexington, SC 29072 / US | [1998/10] |
Former [1993/12] | 01 /
Heil, Thomas F. 101 Hickory Wood Court Easley, SC 29640 / US | ||
02 /
Walrath, Craig A. 205 Fairfax Road Easley, Sc 29642 / US | |||
03 /
Pike, Jimmy D. 119 Firebranch Road Columbia, SC 29212 / US | |||
04 /
McDonald, Edward A. 164 Meadow Wood Drive Lexington, SC 29072 / US | |||
05 /
Cochcroft, Arthur F., Jr. 3209 Witon Road West Columbia, SC 29170 / US | |||
06 /
Raeuber, P. Chris 126 Old Cedar Lane Central, SC 29630 / US | |||
07 /
Robbins, Daniel C. 321 Jamestown Road Easley, SC 29640 / US | |||
08 /
Young, Gene F. 3412 Sweet Springs Road Lexington, SC 29072 / US | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [1998/10] | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Robinson, Robert George International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/12] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308374.5 | 15.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | US19910760786 | 16.09.1991 Original published format: US 760786 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0533430 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0533430 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533430 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F15/16, G06F13/42 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
G06F13/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/12] | G06F13/42, G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/12] | Title | German: | Mehrprozessorrechnersystem | [1993/12] | English: | Multiple processor computer system | [1993/12] | French: | Système d'ordinateur à processeurs multiples | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 27.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8301135 (ROVSING AS CHRISTIAN [DK]) [Y] 1-9 * page 9, line 15 - page 12, line 6; figures 1,2 * * page 19, line 8 - page 20, line 20; figure 10 *; | [Y]EP0290172 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claim - *; | [A]EP0366361 (NCR CO [US]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1; claim - * |