EP0533469 - Expression vector and silkworm larvae transformant containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONG KONG TECH COMPANY LIMITED 29th Floor, East Tower, Bond Centre, 89 Queensway Hong Kong / HK | [1993/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yukun, Sun 500 Caobao Road Shanghai / CN | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey J.A.KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1993/12] | Application number, filing date | 92308458.6 | 17.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | US19910761644 | 18.09.1991 Original published format: US 761644 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533469 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N15/56 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N2710/14143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/12] | Title | German: | Expressionsvektor und diesen enthaltender Seidenwurmtransformant | [1993/12] | English: | Expression vector and silkworm larvae transformant containing the same | [1993/12] | French: | Vecteur d'expression et transformant du ver à soie le contenant | [1993/12] | File destroyed: | 12.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 25.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/33] | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8807087 ; | [A]EP0225777 ; | [Y]EP0127839 ; | [Y]EP0175852 | [XP] - JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY vol. 73, no. PT.7, July 1992, READING, BERKSGB pages 1877 - 1880 H. MORI ET AL. 'Foreign gene expression by a baculovirus vector with an expanded host range' | [Y] - MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY vol. 3, no. 12, December 1983, WASHINGTON DCUS pages 2156 - 65 G.E. SMITH ET AL. 'Production of human beta interferon in insect cells infected with a baculovirus expression vector' | [Y] - VIROLOGY vol. 170, no. 1, May 1989pages 160 - 175 M.A. GONZALEZ ET AL. 'Insertion of the SfMNPV polyhedrin gene into an AcMNPV polyhedrin deletion mutant during viral infection - Potential application of nuclear-polyhedrosis virus as biological control agent' | [Y] - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY vol. 65, no. 7, July 1991, READING, BERKSGB pages 3625 - 3632 A. KONDO ET AL. 'Host range expansion by recombination of the baculoviruses Bombyx-mori nuclear polyhedrosis virus and Autographa-californica nuclear polyhedrosis virus' |