EP0533504 - Dihydropyridine derivatives useful in antitumor therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states PHARMACIA S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 I-20152 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states FARMITALIA CARLO ERBA S.r.l. Via Carlo Imbonati 24 I-20159 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cozzi, Paolo via Zanella 48/5 I-20133 Milan / IT | 02 /
Menichincheri, Maria via Lecco 10 I-20124 Milan / IT | 03 /
Capolongo, Laura Piazzale Siena 18 I-20146 Milan / IT | 04 /
Mongelli, Nicola via Tertulliano 38 I-20137 Milano / IT | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1994/40] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1993/12] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308561.7 | 18.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | GB19910019983 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: GB 9119983 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533504 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533504 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/10, A61K31/445 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
C07D213/80 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/12] | Title | German: | Dihydropyridine zur Anwendung in der Antitumor-Therapie | [1993/12] | English: | Dihydropyridine derivatives useful in antitumor therapy | [1993/12] | French: | Dihydropyridines utilisables dans le thérapie antitumorale | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.02.1997 | GR | 05.02.1997 | AT | 18.09.1997 | DK | 18.09.1997 | GB | 18.09.1997 | IE | 18.09.1997 | ES | 19.09.1997 | SE | 19.09.1997 | BE | 30.09.1997 | CH | 30.09.1997 | LI | 30.09.1997 | [2015/21] |
Former [2004/28] | FR | 05.02.1997 | |
GR | 05.02.1997 | ||
AT | 18.09.1997 | ||
GB | 18.09.1997 | ||
IE | 18.09.1997 | ||
ES | 19.09.1997 | ||
SE | 19.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2002/32] | FR | 05.02.1997 | |
GR | 05.02.1997 | ||
AT | 18.09.1997 | ||
GB | 18.09.1997 | ||
IE | 18.09.1997 | ||
SE | 19.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2001/01] | GR | 05.02.1997 | |
AT | 18.09.1997 | ||
GB | 18.09.1997 | ||
IE | 18.09.1997 | ||
SE | 19.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 05.02.1997 | |
AT | 18.09.1997 | ||
GB | 18.09.1997 | ||
SE | 19.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 18.09.1997 | |
GB | 18.09.1997 | ||
SE | 19.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/46] | GB | 18.09.1997 | |
SE | 19.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/45] | GB | 18.09.1997 | |
SE | 19.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | GB | 18.09.1997 | |
SE | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/35] | SE | 19.09.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0215250 (BOEHRINGER BIOCHEMIA SRL [IT]); | [Y]EP0245918 (GLAXO SPA [IT]); | [Y]DE3711991 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]EP0373645 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]) | Examination | - 8. Camerino Noordwijkerhout Symposium, "Trends in Receptor Research", September 1991 | - Maria Menichincheri, Synthesis of Imidazolyl and Pyridyl derivatives of 1,4-Dihydropyridines Combining Ca-Antagonism and TxA2 Synthase inhibition, 1991 |