EP0589102 - Sanitary napkin having shaping means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coles, Peter Am Hohenstein 1 W-6233 Kelkheim Fischback / DE | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [1994/13] | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 D-65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 92308588.0 | 21.09.1992 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589102 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589102 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0589102 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
A61F13/47218 (EP,US);
A61F13/47263 (EP,US);
A61F13/535 (EP,US);
A61F13/536 (EP,US);
A61F13/539 (EP,US);
A61F2013/455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Damenbinde mit Formänderungsmittel | [1994/13] | English: | Sanitary napkin having shaping means | [1994/13] | French: | Serviette hygiénique avec moyens pour modifier sa forme | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1997
24.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 02
05.11.1997
18.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1997
24.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
02
05.11.1997
18.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1998/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1997
24.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
02
05.11.1997
18.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Friz, Oliver Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1997/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1997
24.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 08.12.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.06.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.1998 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1999 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.10.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.06.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.12.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.02.2000 | Appeal received No. T0215/00 | 22.02.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.06.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 07.06.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0130848 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [Y]EP0325416 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [AD]EP0335252 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [YD]EP0336578 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [X]DE4004729 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON [US]); | [E]WO9301782 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | Examination | EP0136524 | US4795455 | WO9014814 | US5312386 |