EP0535864 - Fabrication of a conductive region in electronic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldman, Leonard Cecil 200 Lorraine Drive Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | 02 /
Higashi, Gregg Sumio 111 Whitenack Road Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | 03 /
Mak, Cecilia Yinsi 51 Stone Run Road Bedminster, New Jersey 07921 / US | 04 /
Miller, Barry 54 Fox Run Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308696.1 | 24.09.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | US19910768503 | 30.09.1991 Original published format: US 768503 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535864 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535864 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L21/288 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
H01L21/288 (EP,US);
H01L21/76879 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/14] | H01L21/90, H01L21/288 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/14] | Title | German: | Herstellung eines leitenden Gebietes in elektronischen Vorrichtungen | [1993/14] | English: | Fabrication of a conductive region in electronic devices | [1993/14] | French: | Fabrication d'une région conductrice dans des dispositifs électroniques | [1993/14] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1196143 ; | [A]JP63012155 ; | [X]DE3916622 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [A]EP0236034 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 490 (E-841)7 November 1989 & JP-A-11 96 143 ( SEIKO EPSON CORP. ) 7 August 1989, & JP1196143 A 19890807 | [A] - SOLID STATE ELECTRONICS vol. 23, no. 8, August 1980, OXFORD GB pages 905 - 907 A.K.DATTA ET AL 'CHARACTERISTICS OF METAL-SEMICONDUCTOR CONTACTS FABRICATED BY THE ELECTROLESS DEPOSITION METHOD' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 217 (E-624)21 June 1988 & JP-A-63 012 155 ( OKI ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD ) 19 January 1988, & JP63012155 A 19880119 | [XP] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 59, no. 26, 23 December 1991, NEW YORK US pages 3449 - 3451 C.Y.MAK ET AL. 'SELECTIVE ELECTROLESS COPPER METALLIZATION OF PALLADIUM SILICIDE ON SILICON SUBSTRATES' | Examination | - J.Vacuum Sci.Tech. vol. 17, no. 4, 1980, pages 775-792 by S.P. Murarka. |