EP0535868 - Improved protected conductive foil assemblage and procedure for preparing same using static electrical forces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.1995 [1995/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOULD ELECTRONICS INC. 35129 Curtis Boulevard Eastlake Ohio 44095-4001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states GOULD ELECTRONICS INC. 35129 Curtis Boulevard Eastlake, Ohio 44095-4001 / US | ||
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states GOULD INC. 35129 Curtis Boulevard Eastlake, Ohio 44095-4001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chamberlain, Jamie H. 8825 Aspen Court Concord, Ohio 44060 / US | 02 /
Callahan, John P. 9500 Curberry Drive Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | 03 /
Savage, Rolland D. 6389 Cumberland Drive Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | 04 /
Burgess, David P. 1190-C Brookline Place Willoughby, Ohio 44094 / US | [1993/17] |
Former [1993/14] | 01 /
Chamberlain, Jamie H. 8825 Aspen Court Concord, Ohio 44060 / US | ||
02 /
Callahan, John P. 9785 Old Johnnycake Ridge Road Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | |||
03 /
Savage, Rolland D. 6389 Cumberland Drive Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | |||
04 /
Burgess, David P. 1190-C Brookline Place Willoughby, Ohio 44094 / US | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1993/14] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308723.3 | 24.09.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | US19910770038 | 01.10.1991 Original published format: US 770038 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535868 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/02, B32B7/06, B32B31/08 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
B32B37/00 (EP);
H05K1/05 (KR);
H05K3/022 (EP);
B32B2037/1063 (EP);
B32B2310/021 (EP);
H05K2201/0355 (EP);
H05K3/025 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/14] | Title | German: | Geschützter leitender Folienaufbau und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung unter Verwendung elektrostatischer Kräfte | [1993/14] | English: | Improved protected conductive foil assemblage and procedure for preparing same using static electrical forces | [1993/14] | French: | Assemblage à feuille conductrice protégée et procédé pour préparer celui-ci en utilisant des forces électriques statiques | [1993/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/06] | 02.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1778825 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [AD]EP0395871 (GOULD INC [US]); | [XP]EP0449647 (GOULD INC [US]) |