|
16.07.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.08.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.05.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.04.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
67 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.12.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1995 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.04.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
27.12.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1993 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |