Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] |
01.12.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] |
04.11.1993 | First examination report | |
19.02.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] |
19.02.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] |