EP0535905 - Optical scanner apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Detwiler, Paul Oliver 2671 Deer Isle Cove Lawrenceville Georgia 30244 / US | 02 /
Mergenthaler, Barry Myron 60179 Christian Hill Road Cambridge, Ohio 43725 / US | [1993/15] |
Former [1993/14] | 01 /
Detwiler, Paul Oliver 10 Garfield Avenue New Concord, Ohio 43762 / US | ||
02 /
Mergenthaler, Barry Myron 60179 Christian Hill Road Cambridge, Ohio 43725 / US | Representative(s) | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Robinson, Robert George International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/14] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308848.8 | 29.09.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | US19910767746 | 30.09.1991 Original published format: US 767746 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535905 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535905 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G02B5/09 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
G06K7/1096 (EP,US);
G02B5/09 (EP,US);
G06K7/10693 (EP,US);
G06K7/10871 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/14] | G06K7/10, G02B26/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/14] | Title | German: | Optische Abtasteinrichtung | [1993/14] | English: | Optical scanner apparatus | [1993/14] | French: | Dispositif d'exploration optique | [1993/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4652732 (NICKL FRANKLYN G [US]); | [A]US4799164 (HELLEKSON RONALD A [US], et al); | [Y]WO8905013 (NCR CO [US]); | [X]EP0444958 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | Examination | JPS63192175 | US4939355 |