EP0536949 - An incoming communications forwarding technique utilizing a called party location indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grimes, Gary Joe 4120 East 115th Place Thornton Colorado 80233 / US | 02 /
Haas, Lawrence John 1182 Cedar Street Broomfield, Colorado 80020 / US | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1993/15] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308949.4 | 01.10.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | US19910773468 | 09.10.1991 Original published format: US 773468 | [1993/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0536949 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0536949 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536949 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/54, H04M3/50, H04M11/02 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
H04M3/42229 (EP,US);
H04M11/022 (EP,US);
H04M3/533 (EP,US);
H04M3/546 (EP,US);
H04Q3/47 (EP,US);
H04M2203/1091 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/15] | Title | German: | Rufumleitungstechnik für ankommende Kommunikationen mit Ortsanzeige von angerufenem Teilnehmer | [1998/17] | English: | An incoming communications forwarding technique utilizing a called party location indicator | [1993/15] | French: | Technique de détournement de communications entrantes utilisant un indicateur de la position de l'abonné appelé | [1993/15] |
Former [1993/15] | Rufumleitungstechnik für ankommende Kommunikationen mit Ortsanzeige von angerufenem Teilnahme | Examination procedure | 11.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 20.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3001746 ; | [Y]US4277649 (SHEINBEIN DANIEL); | [X]EP0152908 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [X]US4680785 (AKIYAMA TADAHIKO [JP], et al); | [X]EP0264092 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4748655 (THROWER KEITH R [GB], et al); | [X]US4752951 (KONNEKER LLOYD K [US]); | [X]GB2198910 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 108 (E-1045)14 March 1991 & JP-A-3 001 746 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 8 January 1991, & JP3001746 A 19910108 |