EP0536952 - Method of draw-forming a metal sheet having an organic film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LIMITED 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LIMITED 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imazu, Katsuhiro 27-101, 6205-1, Izumi-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Akira 25 Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Tomomi 1-6-23-1104, Mori, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/16] |
Former [1993/15] | 01 /
Imazu, Katsuhiro 6205-1, Izumi-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kobayashi, Akira 25 Sachigaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Kobayashi, Tomomi 1-6-23-1104, Mori, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92308983.3 | 01.10.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | JP19910255527 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: JP 25552791 | [1993/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536952 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536952 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B21D24/12 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
B21D24/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Tiefziehen von Metallblech mit einer filmartigen organischen Beschichtung | [1993/15] | English: | Method of draw-forming a metal sheet having an organic film | [1993/15] | French: | Méthode d'étirage d'une feuille de métal ayant un revêtement organique | [1993/15] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 17.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3986382 (MILLER STANLEY J, et al); | [Y]EP0410007 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]); | [Y]GB2219543 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]); | [A]DE735158 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]EP0438774 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) |