EP0536976 - Pourable shortening containing lauric fat and method for preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.1995 [1995/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUNGE FOODS CORPORATION 725 North Kinzie Bradley Illinois 60915 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states BUNGE FOODS CORPORATION 725 North Kinzie Bradley, Illinois 60915 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crosby, Thomas G. 4 Oxford Place Bourbonnais, Illinois 60914 / US | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1993/15] | Harrison, David Christopher MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309089.8 | 06.10.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | US19910773671 | 07.10.1991 Original published format: US 773671 | [1993/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0536976 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0536976 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23D9/00 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
A23D9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/15] | Title | German: | Laurinfett enthaltendes, vergiessbares Backfett und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1993/15] | English: | Pourable shortening containing lauric fat and method for preparing same | [1993/15] | French: | Graisse de cuisson versable, contenant de la graisse laurique et procédé pour la préparer | [1993/15] | File destroyed: | 06.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/25] | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.11.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6232841 ; | [A]US2607695 (AYERS ARNOLD L, et al) [A] 1-5,7,13,16,17 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 34 * * example I * * claims 1,3-8 *; | [A]US3443966 (REID EDWARD J) [A] 1-5,7,13,16,17 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 50 * * examples I,II * * claims 1,4 *; | [A]US4096258 (HANSON HAROLD WAYNE) [A] 1,13 * example . * * claims 1,3,4 *; | [X]GB2006810 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1593946 (BLOHORN SA) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2093679 (GEN FOODS LTD) [A] 1,13* claims 1,4,5,7 *; | [X]EP0063835 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 12 * * page 12, line 23 - line 36 * * claims 1,10 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 12, Database accession no. 87-082664, & JPS6232841 A 19870212 (NIPPON OILS & FATS KK) [A] 1,13 * abstract * | [A] - E. SAMBUC ET AL., "Etude cinétique de la cristallisation des corps gras III - Etude de mélanges binaires", REVUE FRANCAISE DES CORPS GRAS, PARIS FR, (1979), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 181 - 186 [A] 1 * page 182, column 2; table II * * page 183, column 1; table II * * page 185, column 2; figure 5 * * page 186, column 2, paragraph 1 * |