EP0537010 - Door locking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILCO UNICAN, INC. 7301 Decarie Boulevard Montreal Quebec H4P 2G7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states ILCO UNICAN, INC. 7301 Decarie Boulevard Montreal, Quebec H4P 2G7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldman, Ilan 3 Hayasmin Street Herzliya / IL | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Alan, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | [1993/15] | Application number, filing date | 92309191.2 | 08.10.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | IL19160000997 | 11.10.1991 Original published format: IL 99716 | IL19960000997 | 18.10.1991 Original published format: IL 99796 | [1993/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537010 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00, E05B47/00 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
G07C9/00698 (EP);
E05B47/02 (EP);
G07C9/00912 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/15] | Title | German: | Türverriegelungssystem | [1993/15] | English: | Door locking system | [1993/15] | French: | Système de verrouillage de porte | [1993/15] | File destroyed: | 03.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/27] | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA1022652 ; | [Y]FR2653480 ; | [A]US4453390 ; | [A]US4621452 |