EP0537993 - Nicotinic activity of a series of arecolones and isoarecolones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ward, John Stanley 241 East Brunswick Indianapolis, Indiana 46227 / US | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309339.7 | 14.10.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | US19910778022 | 17.10.1991 Original published format: US 778022 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537993 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/70, A61K31/445 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
C07D211/70 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | Nikotina-Rezeptoraktivität eine Reihe von Arecolonen und Isoarecolonen | [1993/16] | English: | Nicotinic activity of a series of arecolones and isoarecolones | [1993/16] | French: | Activité nicotinique d'une série d'arécolines et d'isoarécolines | [1993/16] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/48] | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4710508 (BERGMEIER STEPHEN C [US], et al); | [Y]EP0288394 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) | [X] - J. HETEROCYCLIC CHEM. vol. 27, 1990, pages 1709 - 1712; J.S.WARD AND LEANDER MERRITT: 'The improved convergent synthesis of Arecolones and Isoarecolone' | [Y] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 31, 1988, pages 545 - 554; J.A.WATERS ET AL: 'Synthesis, Pharmacology and Molecular modeling studies of semirigid nicotinic agonists' | [YD] - MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY vol. 36, 1989, pages 177 - 184; C.E.SPIVAK ET AL: 'Binding of semirigid nicotinic agonists to nicotinic and muscarinic receptors' |