EP0538007 - Integrated circuit demountable tab apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matta, Farid 3373 Filomena Court Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
Douglas, Kevin 346 Sonora Drive San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 03 /
Pendse, Rajendra D. 5245 Diamond Common Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 04 /
Afshari, Brahram 654 Arboulda Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 05 /
Scholz, Kenneth D. 4150 Willmar Drive Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309361.1 | 14.10.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | US19910776930 | 15.10.1991 Original published format: US 776930 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0538007 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0538007 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0538007 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/32, H05K7/10, H01R13/24 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
H01L23/4006 (EP,US);
H01L23/32 (EP,US);
H01L23/4985 (EP,US);
H05K3/325 (EP,US);
H05K7/1023 (EP,US);
H05K7/1061 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4062 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4087 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15173 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/16] | H05K3/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/16] | Title | German: | Demontierbare automatische Bandmontagevorrichtung für integrierte Schaltung | [1993/16] | English: | Integrated circuit demountable tab apparatus | [1993/16] | French: | Dispositif démontable de montage automatique sur bande pour circuit intégré | [1993/16] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.12.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/42] | FR | 24.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0214719 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]); | [A]US5046953 (SHREEVE ROBERT W [US], et al); | [XP]EP0505859 (IBM [US]) | [A] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN., vol.36, no.17, July 1988, HASBROUCK HEIGHTSNEW JERSEY page 37 'Tiny module compresses interconnection grid' |