EP0541261 - Method and apparatus for extending material life in a bias transfer roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gross, Robert A. 2081 Harris Road Penfield, New York 14526 / US | 02 /
Pietrowski, Kenneth W. 28 Pine Brook Circle Penfield, New York 14526 / US | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309404.9 | 15.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | US19910789506 | 08.11.1991 Original published format: US 789506 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0541261 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0541261 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541261 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
G03G15/1675 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Verlängerung der Materiallebensdauer einer polarisierten Übertragungswalze | [1993/19] | English: | Method and apparatus for extending material life in a bias transfer roll | [1993/19] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour prolonger la durée de vie du matériau d'un rouleau de transfert polarisé | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3781105 (MEAGHER T); | [A]EP0323226 (CANON KK [JP]) |