EP0541263 - 5-piperazinylalkyl-1,5-benzothiazepinones useful as calcium antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/19] | 5-(Piperidinylalkyl or piperazinylalkyl)-1,5-benzothiazepinones useful as calcium antagonists | ||
[1995/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamori, Teruo 1-8-39, Hikarigaoka Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Harada, Hiroshi 1-20-16, Midorigaoka Toyonaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Sakai, Katsunori 1-4-16, Kaminishi, Hirano-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Iwaki, Kazumi 331 Sinkita Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Matsunaga, Kazuki 6-B-706 Satsukigaokahigashi Suita-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309474.2 | 16.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | JP19910302348 | 21.10.1991 Original published format: JP 30234891 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541263 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541263 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D281/10, A61K31/55 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (KR);
A61K31/55 (KR);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1993/19] | C07D281/10, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, A61K31/55 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | 5- Piperazinylalkyl-1,5-Benzothiazepinone verwendbar als Calciumantagonisten | [1995/02] | English: | 5-piperazinylalkyl-1,5-benzothiazepinones useful as calcium antagonists | [1995/02] | French: | 5- pipérazinylalkyl-1,5-benzothiazépinones utiles comme calcium antagonistes | [1995/02] |
Former [1993/19] | 5-(Piperidinylalkyl oder Piperazinylalkyl)-1,5-Benzothiazepinone verwendbar als Calciumantagonisten | ||
Former [1993/19] | 5-(Piperidinylalkyl or piperazinylalkyl)-1,5-benzothiazepinones useful as calcium antagonists | ||
Former [1993/19] | 5-(pipéridinylalkyl ou pipérazinylalkyl)-1,5-benzothiazépinones utiles comme calcium antagonistes | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/02: Teilanmeldung 94201425.9 eingereicht am 16/10/92 | EPB 1995/02: Divisional application 94201425.9 filed on 16/10/92 | EPB 1995/02: Demande divisionnaire 94201425.9 déposée le 16/10/92 | Examination procedure | 25.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94201425.9 / EP0615971 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4584131 (FLOYD DAVID [US], et al); | [YD]EP0394101 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | [X]EP0429060 (MARION MERRELL DOW INC [US]); | [X]EP0433683 (MARION MERRELL DOW INC [US]) |