EP0539132 - EMC-enclosure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 24101 Salo / FI | [1999/11] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lonka, Pekka Alastuvankatu 3 as 4 SF-24240 Salo / FI | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Frain, Timothy John Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU 14 0NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Frain, Timothy John Patent Department Nokia Mobile Phones St Georges Court St Georges Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309518.6 | 19.10.1992 | [1993/17] | Priority number, date | FI19910004978 | 22.10.1991 Original published format: FI 914978 | [1993/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0539132 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0539132 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/08, H05K9/00 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
H04B1/08 (EP);
H05K9/0026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/17] | Title | German: | Abgeschirmtes Gehäuse für elektromagnetische Kompatibilität | [1993/17] | English: | EMC-enclosure | [1993/17] | French: | Boîtier écran pour la compatibilité électromagnétique | [1993/17] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 17.03.1999 | SE | 17.03.1999 | DE | 18.06.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 17.03.1999 | |
DE | 18.06.1999 | ||
FR | 13.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | DE | 18.06.1999 | |
FR | 13.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/20] | DE | 18.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5014160 ; | [A]US3816911 | Examination | US4337444 | US4838475 |