Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] |
17.11.1993 | Change - representative | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] |
05.08.1993 | Change - classification | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] |
04.08.1993 | Publication of search report | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] |
03.06.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] |