EP0551718 - System and method for ensuring write data integrity in a redundant array data storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED 10435 N. Tantau Avenue Cupertino California 95014-0709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED 10435 N. Tantau Avenue Cupertino, California 95014-0709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lui, Albert 3164 Heritage Valley Drive, San Jose California 95148 / US | 02 /
Walker, Mark S. 20000 Gist Road, Los Gatos California 95030 / US | [1993/29] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1993/29] | Allman, Peter John MARKS & CLERK Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street Manchester M3 3JY / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309635.8 | 21.10.1992 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | US19910797470 | 25.11.1991 Original published format: US 797470 | [1993/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0551718 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0551718 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20, G06F11/14, G06F3/06 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
G06F11/1076 (EP,US);
G06F11/2089 (EP,US);
G06F11/1402 (EP,US);
G06F11/2015 (EP,US);
G06F11/2038 (EP,US);
G06F11/2097 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/29] | G06F11/20, G06F11/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/29] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Sicherung der Schreibdatenintegrität in einem redundanten Matrixdatenspeicherungssystem | [1993/29] | English: | System and method for ensuring write data integrity in a redundant array data storage system | [1993/29] | French: | Système et procédé pour assurer l'intégrité de données d'écriture dans un système à réseau redondant de stockage de données | [1993/29] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/50] | 18.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0434532 (BULL SA [FR]); | [A]WO9113399 (SF2 CORP [US]); | [A]WO9117506 (SF2 CORP [US]); | [Y] - COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY REVIEW vol. 9, no. 3, March 1989, LOS ANGELES, CA, USA page 27 XP000109267 B. BALL ET AL. 'OLTP Systems Need To Be Fault Tolerant' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 16TH VERY LARGE DATA BASES CONFERENCE 1990, BRISBANEAUSTRALIA pages 148 - 161 J. GRAY ET AL. 'Parity Striping of Disc Arrays: Low-Cost Reliable Storage with Acceptable Throughput' | [A] - THE 17TH INT. SYMP. ON FAULT-TOLERANT COMPUTING 6 July 1987, PITTSBURGH, PENNSYLVANIAUSA pages 176 - 181 Y. DISHON ET AL. 'A Highly Available Storage System Using the Checksum Method' |