EP0551719 - Hand-held percussive tool incorporating apparatus for reducing vibration transmission to the user [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY 200 Chestnut Ridge Road Woodcliff Lake, New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY 200 Chestnut Ridge Road Woodcliff Lake New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Best, Anthony Vale Cottage Coulston, Westbury, Wiltshire BA13 4NY / GB | 02 /
Neads, Stephen John 63 St. Mary's Rise, Writhlington Radstock, Bath, Avon BA3 3PD / GB | [1993/29] | Representative(s) | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK RAWORTH HOUSE 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309846.1 | 28.10.1992 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | GB19910026979 | 17.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9126979 | [1993/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551719 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551719 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/24, B25D17/04 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
B25D17/043 (EP);
B25D17/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [1993/29] | Title | German: | Handgehaltenes Schlagwerkzeug mit vibrationsdämpfender Einrichtung | [1993/29] | English: | Hand-held percussive tool incorporating apparatus for reducing vibration transmission to the user | [1993/29] | French: | Outil de frappe porté à main avec dispositif pour réduire la transmission des vibrations aux utilisateurs | [1993/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 17.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 27.02.1997 | [1997/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0336261 ; | [A]US3788404 ; | [A]CH669142 ; | [A]US2440150 ; | [A]NL109403 |