EP0540339 - Pneumatic tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Namito 1-25-11, Fujimoto Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ichiki, Yasufumi 3-5-5, Ogawa-higashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tanabe, Chishiro 3-5-5, Ogawa-higashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1993/18] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Godwin, Edgar James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92309934.5 | 29.10.1992 | [1993/18] | Priority number, date | JP19910287689 | 01.11.1991 Original published format: JP 28768991 | JP19910288017 | 01.11.1991 Original published format: JP 28801791 | JP19910294340 | 11.11.1991 Original published format: JP 29434091 | JP19910294341 | 11.11.1991 Original published format: JP 29434191 | JP19920144591 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14459192 | JP19920144614 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14461492 | [1993/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0540339 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0540339 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0540339 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/12 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
B60C11/11 (EP);
B60C11/12 (EP);
B60C11/1218 (EP);
B60C11/1281 (EP);
B60C11/13 (EP);
B29D2030/0613 (EP);
B60C2011/1213 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/50] |
Former [1993/18] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [1993/18] | English: | Pneumatic tire | [1993/18] | French: | Bandage pneumatique | [1993/18] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP63279903 ; | [Y]US4945966 (OGAWA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]US5024260 (OCHIAI KIYOSHI [JP]); | [A]GB474588 (US RUBBER PROD INC) | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 083 (M-802)27 February 1989 & JP-A-63 279 903 ( TOYO TIRE&RUBBER CO. ) 17 November 1988, & JP63279903 A 19881117 | by applicant | JPS63279903 | JPS63279904 |