EP0544420 - Cryogenic freezer apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | ||
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Appolonia, Jack 2 Spring Lane Yardley, Pennsylvania 19067 / US | 02 /
Wheeler, Clair F. 5 Autumn Drive Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | 03 /
Kapoor, Akhilesh 118 Goodman's Crossing Clark, New Jersey 07066 / US | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | Gough, Peter, et al c/o THE BOC GROUP PLC Patent Department Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | Gough, Peter, et al c/o THE BOC GROUP PLC Patent Department Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310167.9 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | US19910798307 | 25.11.1991 Original published format: US 798307 | [1993/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544420 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544420 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00, F25D3/11 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
A23L3/375 (EP,US);
A23L3/363 (EP,US);
F25D29/001 (EP,US);
F25D3/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/22] | Title | German: | Tiefgefriervorrichtung und -verfahren | [1993/22] | English: | Cryogenic freezer apparatus and method | [1993/22] | French: | Congélateur cryogénique et procédé de congélation | [1993/22] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3728869 (SCHMIDT H); | [A]US4866946 (KLEE DAVID J [US]); | [A]EP0159858 (WILLHOFT EDWARD MAX ADOLF) |