EP0545559 - Separation of gas mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramachandran, Ramakrishnan 232 Hillside Avenue Allendale, New Jersey 07401 / US | 02 /
Shirley, Arthur 373 New Market Road Piscataway, New Jersey 08854 / US | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310200.8 | 06.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | US19910788644 | 06.11.1991 Original published format: US 788644 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0545559 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0545559 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545559 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/104 (EP,US);
B01D2253/106 (EP,US);
B01D2253/25 (EP,US);
B01D2256/10 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2256/24 (EP,US);
B01D2256/245 (EP,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7022 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7025 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40016 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40022 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4003 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40037 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40062 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40064 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40066 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40067 (EP,US);
B01D2259/401 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D53/0473 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1993/23] | Title | German: | Trennung von Gasmischungen | [1993/23] | English: | Separation of gas mixtures | [1993/23] | French: | Séparation de mélanges gazeux | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 17.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/26] | Request for further processing for: | 03.12.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4784672 (SIRCAR SHIVAJI [US]); | [A]EP0426937 (SAIBU GAS CO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0361541 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0324171 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) | Examination | EP0075663 |