EP0545562 - A method of manufacturing a centre electrode for a spark plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-ban, 18-gou Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-Ku Nagoya-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-ban, 18-gou Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-Ku Nagoya-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Takafumi c/o 14-ban, 18-gou, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi / JP | 02 /
Okayama, Tsutomu c/o 14-ban, 18-gou, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi / JP | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310217.2 | 09.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | JP19910319107 | 03.12.1991 Original published format: JP 31910791 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0545562 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0545562 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545562 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01T21/02, H01T13/39 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
H01T21/02 (EP,US);
H01T13/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/23] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren der Mittelelektrode einer Zündkerze | [1993/23] | English: | A method of manufacturing a centre electrode for a spark plug | [1993/23] | French: | Méthode de fabrication de l'électrode centrale d'une bougie d'allumage | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2955222 (OTTO BOESCH); | [A]FR2595015 (BERU WERK RUPRECHT GMBH CO A [DE]) |