EP0546689 - Fuel vapor recovery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABER EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Research Drive Stratford Connecticut 06497 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states SABER EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Research Drive Stratford, Connecticut 06497 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, W. Dwain 124 Catalpa Road Wilton - Connecticut 06987 / US | 02 /
Pyle, James H. 29 Bradley Road Weston - Connecticut 06883 / US | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310313.9 | 12.11.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | US19910791048 | 12.11.1991 Original published format: US 791048 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546689 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546689 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/06 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
B67D7/0482 (EP,US);
F04D25/026 (EP,US);
Y10S141/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | Anlage zur Rückgewinnung von Brennstoffdampf | [1993/24] | English: | Fuel vapor recovery system | [1993/24] | French: | Système de récupération de vapeur de carburant | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 | 12.01.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.01.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 15.02.1995 | MC | 15.02.1995 | AT | 12.11.1995 | DK | 12.11.1995 | PT | 12.11.1995 | ES | 13.11.1995 | [2008/29] |
Former [2004/28] | GR | 15.02.1995 | |
MC | 15.02.1995 | ||
AT | 12.11.1995 | ||
DK | 12.11.1995 | ||
ES | 13.11.1995 | ||
Former [2003/18] | GR | 15.02.1995 | |
MC | 15.02.1995 | ||
AT | 12.11.1995 | ||
DK | 12.11.1995 | ||
Former [2001/24] | GR | 15.02.1995 | |
MC | 15.02.1995 | ||
AT | 12.11.1995 | ||
DK | 12.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 15.02.1995 | |
AT | 12.11.1995 | ||
DK | 12.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 12.11.1995 | |
DK | 12.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/03] | DK | 12.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3016928 (JAY BRANDT ROBERT); | [AD]US4202385 (JEWELL ROY G [US], et al); | [A]DE8610860U ; | [A]DE3916691 (HAYNAL GABOR [DE]) |