EP0542536 - Thermoplastic resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagaoka, Kenji 832-4, Shiizu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 02 /
Hagimori, Hiroshi 1353-4-241, Shiizu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Yasurou 5-9-15, Hatazawaminami Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292 / JP | 04 /
Sanada, Takashi 135, Irayamazu Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 05 /
Okumura, Etsuji 7-3, Satsukigaoka Yotsukaido-shi, Chiba 284 / JP | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/20] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310322.0 | 12.11.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | US19910791734 | 14.11.1991 Original published format: US 791734 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542536 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0542536 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08L71/12, C08K3/22, C08K3/30, C08K9/02, // (C08L77/00, 71:12, 25:04),(C08K3/22, C08L77:00, 71:12, 25:04),(C08K3/30, C08L77:00, 71:12, 25:04) | [1993/20] | CPC: |
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/30 (EP,US);
C08L71/12 (EP,US);
C08L71/123 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/30, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08K9/02, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L71/12, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/20] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung | [1993/20] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition | [1993/20] | French: | Composition de résine thermoplastique | [1993/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.10.1996 | FR | 16.10.1996 | IT | 16.10.1996 | GB | 16.01.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/35] | BE | 16.10.1996 | |
FR | 16.10.1996 | ||
IT | 16.10.1996 | ||
GB | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 16.10.1996 | |
IT | 16.10.1996 | ||
GB | 16.01.1997 | ||
FR | 14.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | BE | 16.10.1996 | |
GB | 16.01.1997 | ||
FR | 14.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | BE | 16.10.1996 | |
FR | 14.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | BE | 16.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0183195 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0231626 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [Y]EP0304041 (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]EP0375177 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |