EP0543568 - High resolution filtering using low resolution processors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.04.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | Change - applicant | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | 14.04.2000 | Change - representative | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globespan Semiconductor Inc. 100 Schultz Drive Red Bank, NJ 07700 / US | [2000/22] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | ||
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amrany, Daniel 15 Woolley Way Wayside, New Jersey 07712 / US | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams, Powell & Associates, 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | ||
Former [1994/08] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1993/21] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) LTD. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310340.2 | 12.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | US19910796143 | 22.11.1991 Original published format: US 796143 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0543568 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0543568 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03H21/00 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
H03H21/0012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/21] | Title | German: | Hochauflösende Filterung unter Verwendung von Prozessoren mit niedriger Auflösung | [1993/21] | English: | High resolution filtering using low resolution processors | [1993/21] | French: | Filtrage à haute résolution utilisant des processeurs à basse résolution | [1993/21] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/20] | 02.01.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0347394 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 3, line 63; figure 3 * [A] 2-9; | [A]FR2293840 (GRETAG AG [CH]) [A] 2,3 * page 6, line 6 - page 6, line 34; figure 3 * |