EP0542578 - Modular radiant plate dryer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radiant Plate Drying Systems Inc. Suite 410 4445 Calgary Trail South Edmonton, Alberta T6H 5R7 / CA | [1995/23] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states 21ST CENTURY DESIGN INC. 410, 4445 Calgary Trail South Edmonton / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bothe, Jürgen 61 Scothaven, 52246 Range Road 232 Sherwood Park, Alberta T8B 1C1 / CA | 02 /
Tansowny, John 10423 - 10 Avenue Edmonton, Alberta T6J 6E9 / CA | 03 /
Wasliw, Ed General Delivery Millet, Alberta T0C 1Z0 / CA | 04 /
Pisio, Steve 10211 - 80 Street Edmonton, Alberta / CA | 05 /
Wolanski, Zbig 4023 Aspen Drive East Edmonton, Alberta T6J 2A7 / CA | 06 /
Razzell, Jim No.1600, 10101 Saskatchewan Drive Edmonton, Alberta T6E 4R6 / CA | 07 /
Ruefli, Alfred 10 Curlew Crescent Sherwood Park, Alberta T8A 4H0 / CA | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | Pidgeon, Robert John, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Pidgeon, Robert John, et al Appleyard Lees & Co. 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 92310444.2 | 16.11.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | US19910791946 | 14.11.1991 Original published format: US 791946 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542578 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/20 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
F26B17/20 (EP,US);
F26B17/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/20] | Title | German: | Modulare Trocknungsvorrichtung mit Strahlungsplatte | [1993/20] | English: | Modular radiant plate dryer apparatus | [1993/20] | French: | Dispositif modulaire de séchage à plaque de radiation | [1993/20] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/15] | 02.11.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9009967 (SCHMIDT GERHARD R [CA], et al); | [Y]FR2647103 (LATAILLADE MAURICE [FR]); | [X]DE8816171U ; | [A]US4351250 (CHARTRAND JOSEPH A, et al); | [A]DE82321 ; | [A]US4430057 (HOOVER DONALD P [US], et al); | [A]US2554769 (ARNOLD LIONEL K); | [A]DE144738 ; | [AP]DE9206872U ; | [A]EP0386274 (SCHMIDT GERHARD R [CA], et al); | [A]DE8908363U ; | [A]FR2337861 (TEXAS RENDERING CO INC [US]); | [A]US4509273 (ROISEN DAVID [US]) |