blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0544530

EP0544530 - Process for producing epsilon-caprolactam by Beckmann-rearrangement in the gas phase in the presence of a zeolite catalyst and water [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Former [1996/38]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Former [1993/22]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kajikuri, Hiroshi
1-2-40, Hirata
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP
02 / Kitamura, Masaru
1-9-1-402, Tamagawa
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
03 / Higashio, Yasuhiko
9-6-3-304, Honmachi
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560 / JP
[1993/22]
Representative(s)Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al
KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street
London, WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/22]Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al
KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street
London, WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date92310818.726.11.1992
[1993/22]
Priority number, dateJP1991031249127.11.1991         Original published format: JP 31249191
[1993/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0544530
Date:02.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0544530
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1993
ClassificationIPC:C07D201/04, B01J29/04
[1993/22]
CPC:
B01J29/04 (EP,US); C07D201/04 (EP,KR,US); Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1993/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Epsilon-Caprolactam durch Beckmann-Umlagerung in der Gasphase in der Gegenwart eines Zeolith-Katalysators und Wasser[1993/22]
English:Process for producing epsilon-caprolactam by Beckmann-rearrangement in the gas phase in the presence of a zeolite catalyst and water[1993/22]
French:Procédé pour la préparation d'epsilon-caprolactame par transposition de Beckmann en phase gazeuse et en présence d'un catalysateur contenant une zéolithe et d'eau[1993/22]
Examination procedure13.10.1993Examination requested  [1993/50]
19.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1999Fee for grant paid
13.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0236092  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [A]EP0234088  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [Y]EP0369364  (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]);
 [YP]EP0494535  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [Y]DE1545789  (BAYER AG);
 [X]EP0388070  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al);
 [X]EP0380364  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [A]EP0242960  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP])
by applicantJPH02275850
 JPH02250866
 EP0380364
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.