EP0549198 - Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoie, Hiroshi, Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311241.1 | 09.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910341166 | 24.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34116691 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549198 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
G03C7/3022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | Farbphotographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1993/26] | English: | Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material | [1993/26] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière | [1993/26] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 31.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/36] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6324237 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]EP0451859 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |