EP0546833 - Calcium-regulated promoter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS SERONO S.A. La Calle Genova 17-Planta 6 28004 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states LABORATORIOS SERONO S.A. La Calle Genova 17-Planta 6 E-28004 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ortega, Antonio Daza Santa Maria de las Nieves, 34 E-Benacazon (Seville) / ES | 02 /
Gil, Jose Antonio Avd. Mariano Andres, 18-3' D E-24008 Leon / ES | 03 /
Garcia, Tomas Vigal C/Alvaro Lopez Nunez, 10-4 D E-24002 Leon / ES | 04 /
Martin, Juan Francisco Avd Facultad de Veterinaria, 13-4A E-24002 Leon / ES | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1993/24] | Froud, Clive ELKINGTON AND FIFE, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311292.4 | 10.12.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | ES19910002765 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: ES 9102765 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0546833 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0546833 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546833 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/76, C12N1/21, // C12N15/53, C12N15/54 ,(C12N1/21, C12R1:465) | [1993/24] | CPC: |
C12N9/001 (EP,US);
C12N15/76 (EP,US);
C12N9/12 (EP,US);
C12Y113/11001 (EP,US);
C12Y113/11002 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | Kalzium-geregelter Promotor | [1993/24] | English: | Calcium-regulated promoter | [1993/24] | French: | Promoteur régulé par le calcium | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9014426 (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS [NL], et al) [DY] 1,2* the whole document especially page 18 line 16- page 19 line 5 * | [DY] - V. BERNAN ET AL, "The nucleotide sequence of the tyrosinase gene from Streptomyces antibioticus and charcterization of the gene gene product", GENE, AMSTERDAM NL, (1985), vol. 37, pages 101 - 110 [DY] 1,2 * the whole document especially page 104 * | [Y] - J.A. GIL AT AL, "Cloning and expression of a p-aminobenzoic acid synthetase gene of the candicidin-producing Streptomyces griseus", GENE, AMSTERDAM NL, (198311), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 119 - 132 [Y] 1,2 * page 131 * | [DA] - E. KATZ ET AL, "Cloning and Expression of the tyrosinase gene from Streptomyces antibioticus in Streptomyces lividans", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, (198309), vol. 129, no. 9, pages 2703 - 2714 |