EP0549313 - N-bit wide parallel rotation algorithm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadakia, Vinod K. 29616 Stonecrest Road Rancho Palos Verdes, California 90274 / US | 02 /
Kang, Christine 3655 May Street Los Altos, California 90066 / US | 03 /
Kellman, Jeffrey N. 13801 Yukon Avenue, No.11 Hawthorne, California 90250 / US | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Xerox Limited Patents Department Xerox Technical Centre Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts AL7 1HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1993/26] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311668.5 | 21.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | US19910811865 | 23.12.1991 Original published format: US 811865 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0549313 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0549313 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0549313 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/60 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
G06T3/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/26] | G06F15/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/26] | Title | German: | N-Bit paralleler Drehungsalgorithmus | [1993/26] | English: | N-bit wide parallel rotation algorithm | [1993/26] | French: | Algorithme parallèle de rotation à N-bits | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 11.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4806920 (SAWADA HACHIRO [JP]); | [A]GB2210760 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0433645 (XEROX CORP [US]) |