EP0550238 - A double action pistol with improved firing mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAAS - ISRAEL INDUSTRIES LTD. 64 Sderoth Bialik, P.O.Box 1044 Ramat Hasharon 47100 / IL | [1993/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meller, Yehuda 9 Zefat St Holon 58552 / IL | 02 /
Massimo, Tanfoglio Via Valtromtia 39/41 Gardone 25063 / IT | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311682.6 | 22.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | IL19480001005 | 30.12.1991 Original published format: IL 100548 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550238 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550238 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F41A19/14, F41A19/53, F41A17/82, F41A17/74, F41A19/48 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
F41A17/82 (EP,US);
F41A17/74 (EP,US);
F41A19/14 (EP,US);
F41A19/45 (EP,US);
F41A19/47 (EP,US);
F41A19/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/27] | Title | German: | Spannabzug-Pistole mit verbessertem Abfeuerungsmechanismus | [1993/27] | English: | A double action pistol with improved firing mechanism | [1993/27] | French: | Pistolet à double action comportant un mécanisme de mise à feu amélioré | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/10] | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.1996 | DK | 22.05.1996 | ES | 22.05.1996 | FR | 22.05.1996 | GR | 22.05.1996 | IT | 22.05.1996 | NL | 22.05.1996 | PT | 22.08.1996 | SE | 22.08.1996 | GB | 22.12.1996 | IE | 22.12.1996 | BE | 31.12.1996 | CH | 31.12.1996 | LI | 31.12.1996 | LU | 31.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
ES | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
NL | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.12.1996 | ||
IE | 22.12.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
ES | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.12.1996 | ||
IE | 22.12.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [2001/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.12.1996 | ||
IE | 22.12.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.12.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
IT | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.12.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.12.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.12.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.12.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
CH | 31.12.1996 | ||
LI | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
FR | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 22.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0057733 (LLAMA GABILONDO & CIA [ES]); | [A]WO8203910 (GLOCK GASTON); | [A]US4400900 (HILLBERG ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US5000075 (TUMA MARTIN [CH]); | [A]US5067266 (FINDLAY DAVID [US]) |