EP0557658 - Raman spectroscopy of respiratory gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlsen, William F. 111 Harkins Road Woodside, California 94062 / US | 02 /
Simons, Tad D. 155 Walter Hays Drive Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 03 /
Pittaro, Richard J. 70 Curry Court San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 04 /
Perry, Jeffrey 10182 Adriana Avenue Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 05 /
Hopkins II, George W. 521 S. Castlerock Terrace Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 06 /
Gray, Damien F. 1590 Latham Street Mountain View, Calif. 94041 / US | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311749.3 | 23.12.1992 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | US19920840436 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: US 840436 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557658 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557658 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/083, G01J3/44 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
G01J3/44 (EP,US);
A61B5/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/35] | Title | German: | Ramanspektroskopie von Atemgasen | [1993/35] | English: | Raman spectroscopy of respiratory gases | [1993/35] | French: | Spectroscopie Raman des gaz de respiration | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4648714 (BENNER ROBERT E [US], et al); | [YD]US4784486 (VAN WAGENEN RICHARD A [US], et al); | [A]US3951526 (GROSSMAN JACK J); | [A]WO8806725 (SCIENT GENERICS LTD [GB]); | [AD]DE2723939 (ALBRECHT HANS JOERG); | [AD]US3704951 (CHUPP VERNON L) | Examination | EP0442738 |