Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] |
12.01.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] |
21.12.1995 | Renewal fee | |
05.10.1994 | First examination report | |
14.07.1994 | Change - representative | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |
10.12.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] |
10.12.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] |