EP0550292 - Tissue protective tocopherol analogs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grisar, Martin J. Lotissement Wingersbach, 7 Rue de Mulhouse F-67160 Wissembourg / FR | 02 /
Petty, Margaret A. 5 Rue Schimper F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
Bolkenius, Frank Bierkellerstrasse 15B W-7640 Kehl / DE | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400006.0 | 02.01.1992 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550292 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/72, A61K31/355 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
C07D311/58 (EP,US);
C07D311/78 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | FR [1993/27] | Title | German: | Tocopherol-Analog zum Gewebeschutz | [1993/27] | English: | Tissue protective tocopherol analogs | [1993/27] | French: | Analogues de tocophérol de protection des tissus | [1993/27] | File destroyed: | 30.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/40] | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.02.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0369874 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, no. 9, September 1979, Letchworth, GBpages 2124 - 2129; J.M. AKKERMAN ET AL.: 'The synthesis of alpha-tocopherol via 2-(sulphinylmethyl) chromans' |