EP0497675 - Process for manufacturing a fine dendritic cadmium powder and powder obtained by this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALEUROP S.A. Le Péripole 118, 58, rue Roger Salengro F-94126 Fontenay-sous-Bois Cédex / FR | [1992/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albert, Luc 13, rue de Bures F-78990 Elancourt / FR | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400200.9 | 27.01.1992 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | FR19910000922 | 28.01.1991 Original published format: FR 9100922 | [1992/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497675 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497675 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C25C5/02 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
C25C5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines feinen dendritischen Pulvers und nach diesem Verfahren erzeugtes Pulver | [1992/32] | English: | Process for manufacturing a fine dendritic cadmium powder and powder obtained by this process | [1992/32] | French: | Procédé d'obtention d'une poudre fine de cadmium dendritique et poudre obtenue par le procédé | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 31.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1997 | [2000/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP3153892 ; | [YD]JP55076569 ; | [A]US3326721 (HENDERSON IAN H S, et al); | [A]US3400056 (STANLEY HILLS); | [YD]FR2194792 (MALLORY & CO INC P R [US]) | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 385 27 Septembre 1991 & JP-A-3 153 892 ( DOWA MINING CO LTD ) 1 Juillet 1991, & JP3153892 A 00000000 | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 121 (E-23)(603) 27 Août 1980 & JP-A-55 076 569 ( SANYO DENKI K.K. ) 9 Juin 1980, & JP55076569 A 00000000 |