EP0498706 - Process for the preparation of (-)-(2R,3S)-2,3-epoxy-3-(4-methoxyphenyl)methylpropionate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/33] | Process for the preparation of (-)-(2R,3S)-2,3-epoxy-3-(4-methoxyphenyl)methylprionate | ||
[1995/45] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, Avenue Galilée 92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | [2000/22] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, Avenue Galilée F-92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zard, Lydia 6, Impasse des Quatre Vents, La Croix Audierne F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | 02 /
Tixidre, Arlette 69, rue de Paris F-91400 Orsay / FR | 03 /
Rossey, Guy 10, rue Paul Verlaine F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | 04 /
Wick, Alexander 10, boulevard des Plants F-78860 Saint Nom la Bretèche / FR | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Ludwig, Jacques, et al Sanofi-Aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Ludwig, Jacques, et al SYNTHELABO, Service Brevets, B.P. 72 F-92352 Le Plessis Robinson Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/33] | Ludwig, Jacques SYNTHELABO, Service Brevets, B.P. 72 F-92352 Le Plessis-Robinson Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400268.6 | 03.02.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | FR19910001427 | 08.02.1991 Original published format: FR 9101427 | [1992/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498706 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498706 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0498706 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12P41/00, C12P17/02, C12P7/62 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
C12P41/005 (EP,US);
C12P17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von (-)-(2R,3S)-2,3-Epoxy-3-(4-Methoxyphenyl)propionat-methylester | [1992/33] | English: | Process for the preparation of (-)-(2R,3S)-2,3-epoxy-3-(4-methoxyphenyl)methylpropionate | [1995/45] | French: | Procédé de préparation du (-)-(2R,3S)-2,3-époxy-3-(4-méthoxyphényl)propionate de méthyle | [1992/33] |
Former [1992/33] | Process for the preparation of (-)-(2R,3S)-2,3-epoxy-3-(4-methoxyphenyl)methylprionate | Examination procedure | 28.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 10.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.1996
09.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE Zambon Group S.p.A. via Lillo del Duca, 10 20091 BRESSO Milan / IT | [1997/03] |
Former [1996/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.1996
ZAMBON GROUP S.p.A. Via Lillo del Duca, 10 I-20091 Bresso (Milano) / IT Opponent's representative Panossian, Stefano (Employee) ZAMBON GROUP S.p.A., via della Chimica, 9 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | 19.09.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.1997 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.1997 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 02.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.08.1999 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.03.2000 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.11.1995 | MC | 08.11.1995 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | GB | 08.11.1995 | |
MC | 03.02.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
GB | 08.11.1995 | ||
MC | 08.11.1995 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
GB | 08.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0343714 (STAMICARBON [NL]); | [Y]EP0344791 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]); | [Y]EP0362556 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) | [Y] - BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING. vol. 26, no. 12, Décembre 1984, NEW YORK US pages 1449 - 1454; BERNARD CAMBOU ET AL.: 'Comparison of different strategies for the lipase-catalyzed preparative resolution of racemic acids and alcohols:Asymmetric hydrolysis,esterification, and transesterification' |