EP0498726 - Process and apparatus for the catalytic conversion of an oxygenated compound into olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/33] | Process and apparatus for catalytic conversion in a fluidised bed of a feed compring an oxygenated compound | ||
[1995/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hugues, François 10 Chemin du Clos Challans, Charly F-69390 Vernaison / FR | 02 /
Vuillemot, Daniel 27 rue du l'Haye F-69230 St Genis Laval / FR | 03 /
Burzynski, Jean-Pierre 25, Rue du Brulet F-69005 Lyon France / FR | 04 /
Galtier, Pierre Centre Hospitalier Mont Salamon, BP 12 F-38209 Vienne Cédex / FR | 05 /
Gauthier, Thierry 13, Allée des Muses F-69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Andreeff, François, et al INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE Patent Division 4 rue de la Paroisse 78400 Chatou / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | Andreeff, François, et al INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois-Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400301.5 | 05.02.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | FR19910001519 | 07.02.1991 Original published format: FR 9101519 | [1992/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498726 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498726 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C11/02, C07C1/20, B01J8/24, B04C5/081, B04C5/103 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
B04C7/00 (EP,US);
B01J8/005 (EP,US);
B01J8/1863 (EP,US);
B04C3/00 (EP,US);
B04C3/06 (EP,US);
C07C1/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/20, C07C11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1992/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur katalytischen Umsetzung einer Sauerstoffverbindung in Olefine | [1995/18] | English: | Process and apparatus for the catalytic conversion of an oxygenated compound into olefins | [1995/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la conversion d'un composé oxygéné en hydrocarbures oléfiniques | [1995/18] |
Former [1992/33] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur katalytischen Umsetzung in einem Fliessbett von einer Zufuhr, die eine Sauerstoffverbindung enthält | ||
Former [1992/33] | Process and apparatus for catalytic conversion in a fluidised bed of a feed compring an oxygenated compound | ||
Former [1992/33] | Procédé et dispositif de conversion catalytique en lit entraîné d'une charge contenant un composé oxygéné | Examination procedure | 22.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4197418 (LEE WOOYOUNG [US], et al) |