EP0506496 - Cage made of assembled elements, especially for roller bearings with high service temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.N.R. ROULEMENTS Boîte Postale 17 1, rue des Usines 74010 Annecy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states S.N.R. ROULEMENTS Boîte Postale 17 1, rue des Usines F-74010 Annecy Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alff, Denis 91, Boulevard du Fier F-74000 Annecy / FR | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Ernst-Schonberg, Michel, et al REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Service 02 67 8-10, Avenue Emile Zola 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Ernst-Schonberg, Michel, et al REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Service 02 67 8-10, Avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400310.6 | 07.02.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | FR19910003858 | 29.03.1991 Original published format: FR 9103858 | [1992/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506496 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506496 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/38, F16C33/44 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
F16C33/3831 (EP);
F16C33/3862 (EP);
F16C33/44 (EP);
F16C43/08 (EP);
F16C19/06 (EP);
F16C2206/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Aus zusammengesetzten Teilen hergestellter Käfig, insbesondere für Wälzlager mit hoher Betriebstemperatur | [1992/40] | English: | Cage made of assembled elements, especially for roller bearings with high service temperature | [1992/40] | French: | Cage à éléments assemblés, notamment pour roulements à haute température de fonctionnement | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1563935 ; | [A]FR807508 ; | [A]FR756333 ; | [A]DE282425 ; | [A]EP0304872 ; | [A]DE923583 | Examination | FR2630171 | FR2562615 |