EP0504043 - Cosmetic composition containing phospholipid transfer proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states ELF SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maureaud, Thierry 61 Les Jardins de Nambours F-31650 Auzielle / FR | 02 /
Laruel, René 35 rue des Pêcheries B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | 03 /
Sabadie, Michel Rue de la Fontaine Saint-Germain F-27500 Bernay / FR | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Gillard, Marie-Louise Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400630.7 | 11.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | FR19910002985 | 12.03.1991 Original published format: FR 9102985 | [1992/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504043 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/00 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/395 (EP);
A61K8/14 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP);
A61K8/645 (EP);
A61K8/9728 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | Phospholipidentransferprotein enthaltendes kosmetisches Präparat | [1992/38] | English: | Cosmetic composition containing phospholipid transfer proteins | [1992/38] | French: | Composition cosmétique à base de protéine de transfert de phospholipides | [1992/38] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/48] | 29.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2631236 (SCHMIDT KARL [DE]) | [YD] - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, vol. 794, 1984, pages 385-391, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; G. DAUM et al.: "Phospholipid transfer in yeast. Isolation and partial characterization of a phospholipid transfer from yeast cytosol" |