EP0504062 - Integrated circuit with servo-controlled impedances and application to transceivers, particularly for communication between units of an information system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL S.A. 68, route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states BULL S.A. 68, route de Versailles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | ||
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states BULL S.A. Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marbot, Roland 121, avenue de Malakoff F-75116 Paris / FR | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Colombe, Michel, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA Poste courrier:LV 58F35 68 route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Colombe, Michel, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA Poste courrier:LV 59C18 68 route de Versailles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | ||
Former [1992/38] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie Bull S.A., 121, avenue de Malakoff, PC 8M006 F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400661.2 | 12.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | FR19910003125 | 14.03.1991 Original published format: FR 9103125 | [1992/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504062 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504062 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/28, H04B3/02, G06F13/38 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
H03H11/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | Integrierte Schaltung mit servogesteuerten Impedanzen und Anwendung für Senderempfänger, insbesondere für die Kommunikation zwischen Einheiten eines Informationssystems | [1992/38] | English: | Integrated circuit with servo-controlled impedances and application to transceivers, particularly for communication between units of an information system | [1992/38] | French: | Circuit intégré à impédances asservies et application aux émetteurs-récepteurs, notamment pour la communication entre unités d'un système informatique | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 12.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58159016 ; | [A]DE2923277 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 280 (E-216)14 Décembre 1983 & JP-A-58 159 016 ( SONY ) 21 Septembre 1983, & JP58159016 A 00000000 | Examination | JP55042480 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 75 (E-013) & JP-A-55 042 480, & JP55042480 A 00000000 |