EP0509911 - Hybrid vibration damper with active magnetic vibrator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE MECANIQUE MAGNETIQUE S.A. B.P. 2282- 2 rue des Champs F-27950 Saint-Marcel / FR | [1992/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Habermann, Helmut 63 rue de Bizy F-27200 Vernon / FR | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401050.7 | 15.04.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | FR19910004656 | 16.04.1991 Original published format: FR 9104656 | [1992/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509911 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0509911 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/03, F16F1/54, F16F7/10, F16C39/06, H02K5/24, G05D19/02 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
F16C32/0444 (EP);
F16F15/03 (EP);
F16F7/1011 (EP);
G05D19/02 (EP);
H02K5/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/43] | Title | German: | Hybridschwingungsdämpfer mit aktivem magnetischen Schwingungserzeuger | [1992/43] | English: | Hybrid vibration damper with active magnetic vibrator | [1992/43] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations hybride à vibrateur magnétique actif | [1992/43] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.07.1995 | SE | 19.10.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 19.07.1995 | |
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 19.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1135943 ; | [AD]EP0338933 ; | [AD]EP0275791 ; | [A]GB2222657 ; | [A]GB2222279 ; | [A]DE1072017 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 385 (M-864)(3733) 25 Août 1989 & JP-A-1 135 943 ( HITACHI ) 29 Mai 1989, & JP1135943 A 00000000 | Examination | FR2630354 | FR2609133 |