EP0514237 - Pallet for stocking, handling and transporting of at least two piles of stackable chairs arranged side by side [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GROSFILLEX S.A.R.L. Arbent F-01107 Oyonnax / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states GROSFILLEX S.A.R.L. Société à responsabilité limitée dite : Arbent F-01107 Oyonnax / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vuillod, Gérard 5, rue des Rippes F-01610 Arbent / FR | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Caunet, Jean, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Caunet, Jean, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401212.3 | 29.04.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | FR19910006049 | 17.05.1991 Original published format: FR 9106049 | [1992/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514237 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514237 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/26, B65D19/44 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
B65D19/0095 (EP);
B65D19/44 (EP);
B65D2519/00273 (EP);
B65D2519/00293 (EP);
B65D2519/00298 (EP);
B65D2519/00323 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP);
B65D2519/00557 (EP);
B65D2571/00018 (EP);
B65D2585/648 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | Palette zum Lagern, Handhaben und Transportieren von mindestens zwei Stapeln stapelbarer Stühle Seite an Seite | [1992/47] | English: | Pallet for stocking, handling and transporting of at least two piles of stackable chairs arranged side by side | [1992/47] | French: | Palette pour le stockage, la manutention et le transport d'au moins deux piles de fauteuils gerbables disposés côte à côte | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.1995 | DK | 04.01.1995 | ES | 04.01.1995 | GB | 04.01.1995 | GR | 04.01.1995 | IT | 04.01.1995 | NL | 04.01.1995 | PT | 04.04.1995 | SE | 04.04.1995 | DE | 05.04.1995 | BE | 30.04.1995 | CH | 30.04.1995 | LI | 30.04.1995 | LU | 30.04.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
DK | 04.01.1995 | ||
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
GR | 04.01.1995 | ||
IT | 04.01.1995 | ||
NL | 04.01.1995 | ||
PT | 04.04.1995 | ||
SE | 04.04.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
DK | 04.01.1995 | ||
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
IT | 04.01.1995 | ||
NL | 04.01.1995 | ||
PT | 04.04.1995 | ||
SE | 04.04.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
DK | 04.01.1995 | ||
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
NL | 04.01.1995 | ||
PT | 04.04.1995 | ||
SE | 04.04.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
NL | 04.01.1995 | ||
PT | 04.04.1995 | ||
SE | 04.04.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
NL | 04.01.1995 | ||
PT | 04.04.1995 | ||
SE | 04.04.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
NL | 04.01.1995 | ||
PT | 04.04.1995 | ||
SE | 04.04.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
NL | 04.01.1995 | ||
SE | 04.04.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
NL | 04.01.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
GB | 04.01.1995 | ||
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 04.01.1995 | |
DE | 05.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 04.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4050664 (DALEY THOMAS G); | [A]FR2436080 (BRASSERIES STE EUROP); | [A]EP0251961 (KRONENBOURG BRASSERIES [FR]) |