EP0514252 - Method to detect moving sources and to estimate their path [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solal, Marc THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 02 /
Pillon, Denis THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/47] | Turlèque, Clotilde THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401287.5 | 12.05.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | FR19910005808 | 14.05.1991 Original published format: FR 9105808 | [1992/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514252 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0514252 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/66, G01S11/14 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
G01S11/14 (EP);
G01S15/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wahrnehmung von bewegenden Quellen und zur Schätzung ihrer Bahn | [1992/47] | English: | Method to detect moving sources and to estimate their path | [1992/47] | French: | Procédé pour détecter des sources en mouvement et estimer leur trajectoire | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 13.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3345021 ; | [A]US4661938 | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, Vol.76, No.4, Oct. 1984, New York, USA DOMMERMUTH ET AL: "Estimating the trajectory of an accelerationless aircraft by means of a stationary acoustic sensor"; pages 1114-1122. | [AD] - CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE TWENTY-THIRD ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS, 30 Oct.-1 Nov. 1989, Pacific Grove, Calif., US. PASSERIEUX ET AL: "Track to track association performed on mahalanobis distance in both observable and unobservable situations"; pages 405-410. |