EP0514254 - Signal processing method for infra-red target detection, especially with a low thermal contrast, and circuit arrangement for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertrand, Francis THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 02 /
Blondel, Philippe THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/47] | Turlèque, Clotilde THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401289.1 | 12.05.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | FR19910005811 | 14.05.1991 Original published format: FR 9105811 | [1992/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514254 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/33, H04N5/20 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
H04N5/20 (EP);
H04N23/23 (EP);
H04N25/671 (EP);
H04N25/76 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | Signalverarbeitungsverfahren zur Infrarot-Zieldetektion, insbesondere mit einem niedrigen, thermischen Kontrast, und Schaltungsanordnung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1992/47] | English: | Signal processing method for infra-red target detection, especially with a low thermal contrast, and circuit arrangement for carrying out this method | [1992/47] | French: | Procédé de traitement de signal pour la détection infra-rouge de cible, notamment à faible contraste thermique, et circuit de mise en oeuvre | [1992/47] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 01.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/23] | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0052024 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [Y]US4366440 (OLSON CHARLES L, et al); | [A]EP0193443 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]US4937671 (ENGEL CHRISTOPHER M [US]); | [Y]DE3938128 ; | [A]EP0419342 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |