EP0516552 - Dust collector for collecting dust in a cathode ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | ||
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states GOLDSTAR CO. LTD. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Myoung Ho 31-7, Song Jeong-Dong Kumi-City, Kyoungsangbuk-Do / KR | 02 /
Whang, Cheol Ho, c/o GOLDSTAR CO., LTD. 20 Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Ku, Seoul / KR | [1993/03] |
Former [1992/49] | 01 /
Park, Myoung Ho 31-7, Song Jeong-Dong Kumi-City, Kyoungsangbuk-Do / KR | ||
02 /
Whang, Cheol Ho 108-15, Kongdan-Dong Kumi-City, Kyoungsangbuk-Do / KR | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/49] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401473.1 | 29.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | KR19890004991 | 30.05.1991 Original published format: KR 894991 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516552 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516552 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/84, H01J3/40 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
H01J3/40 (EP,US);
H01J29/48 (KR);
H01J29/84 (EP,KR,US);
H01J9/38 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1992/49] | Title | German: | Staubsammler zum Sammeln von Staub in einer Kathodenstrahlröhre | [1992/49] | English: | Dust collector for collecting dust in a cathode ray tube | [1992/49] | French: | Collecteur de poussière pour ramasser la poussière dans une tube à rayons cathodique | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1099721 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]US4665340 (ODENTHAL CONRAD J [US], et al) |