EP0517611 - Cathode ray tube, and method of forming a nonglare film on a display surface thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Kunio c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Setsuda, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401571.2 | 05.06.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | JP19910136602 | 07.06.1991 Original published format: JP 13660291 | JP19910359413 | 27.12.1991 Original published format: JP 35941391 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517611 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517611 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/86, H01J29/89, G02B1/10 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
G02B1/16 (EP,US);
H01J29/88 (KR);
G02B1/11 (US);
G02B1/116 (EP);
H01J29/868 (EP);
H01J29/896 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/50] | Title | German: | Kathodenstrahlröhre und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Blendschutzschicht auf einer Anzeigeoberfläche | [1992/50] | English: | Cathode ray tube, and method of forming a nonglare film on a display surface thereof | [1992/50] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodiques et procédé de formation d'une couche antiéblouissante sur une surface d'affichage | [1992/50] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63143705 ; | [A]FR2629268 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [X] - SID INT.SYMP.DISGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS vol. 20, May 1989, BALTIMORE, US pages 270 - 273; H KAWAMURA ET AL.: 'Combined antistatic and antireflecting coating for CRTs' | [Y] - ENGINEERING, MATERIALS AND DESIGN. vol. 27, no. 1, January 1983, LONDON GB page 13; 'Screen coating reduces eyestrain' | [X] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 8830, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 88-208235 & JP-A-63 143 705 (SHOKUBAI KASEI KOGYO) 16 June 1988, & JP63143705 A 19880616 | [A] - ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND APPLICATIONS. vol. 10, no. 1, 1990, EINDHOVEN NL pages 48 - 52; A VAN DEN EEDEN ET AL.: 'Colour monitor tubes with magnetic-field supression and antistatic coating' |